Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 575 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 10965 Month
» 163918 Year
» 1829294 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1628 m/e 04/1929
British Railways 31628 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/06/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1929
RDG   Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
EXJ   Exmouth Junction 3w/e 28/05/1949
GFD   Guildford 5w/e 04/02/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC GFD Guildford 5w/e 04/02/1950
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1929 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1628
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31628    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (GFD)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31628    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev