Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 27 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 845 Week
» 17796 Month
» 170749 Year
» 1836125 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1632 m/e 03/1931
British Railways 31632 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1931
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 33 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1931
BAS   Basingstoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GFD   Guildford 5w/e 04/02/1950
71B   Bournemouth m/e 31/08/1950
71C   Dorchester 4w/e 07/10/1950
71C   Dorchester 5w/e 31/10/1950
70D   Basingstoke 8w/e 13/05/1954
70C   Guildford 6w/e 18/06/1954
71B   Bournemouth 5w/e 11/03/1955
71A   Eastleigh 6w/e 14/06/1959
72C   Yeovil Town 4w/e 10/03/1960
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE BAS Basingstoke 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC GFD Guildford 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 71C Dorchester 5w/e 31/10/1950
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 71C Dorchester 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 11/03/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1931 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1632
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31632    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (GFD)    
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dorchester (71C)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dorchester (71C)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31632    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev