Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 575 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 10965 Month
» 163918 Year
» 1829294 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1634 m/e 04/1931
British Railways 31634 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sun 29/12/1963
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1931
BAS   Basingstoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
EXJ   Exmouth Junction 3w/e 28/05/1949
YEO   Yeovil Town 3w/e 31/12/1949
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
70D   Basingstoke 7w/e 27/06/1951
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 21/06/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE BAS Basingstoke 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC YEO Yeovil Town 3w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms w/e 21/06/1955
WDN   w/e 29/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1634
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31634    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (YEO)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
29/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31634    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev