Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 523 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4205 Week
» 10913 Month
» 163866 Year
» 1829242 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1636 m/e 04/1931
British Railways 31636 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/06/1963
Service Life 32 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1931
SAL   Salisbury on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
SAL   Salisbury 3w/e 31/12/1949
YEO   Yeovil Town 5w/e 04/02/1950
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
72B   Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951
71A   Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955
70C   Guildford 7w/e 27/08/1956
70A   Nine Elms m/e 09/11/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 09/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 3w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC YEO Yeovil Town 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 70C Guildford q/e 27/08/1956
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   w/e 09/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1636
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31636    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL)    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (YEO)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
27/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31636    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev