|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1963 | Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) | Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1931 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1637 Built at Ashford Works |
||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (RED) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31637 | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
30/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Faversham (73E) | ||
13/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Faversham (73E) | ||
01/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fratton (71D) | ||
11/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
10/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
21/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31637 |