Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 533 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4215 Week
» 10923 Month
» 163876 Year
» 1829252 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1639 m/e 05/1931
British Railways 31639 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/06/1966
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1931
FAV   Faversham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BM   Bournemouth 5w/e 12/02/1949
FAV   Faversham 4w/e 12/03/1949
73C   Hither Green 7w/e 22/04/1950
72B   Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951
72C   Yeovil Town 9w/e 30/06/1952
72B   Salisbury 5w/e 14/02/1953
71A   Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955
70C   Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 05/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FAV Faversham m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC BM Bournemouth 5w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 7w/e 22/04/1950
LOAN 73C Hither Green on 12/05/1951
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 19/11/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 05/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 London to Hastings Just before Bo-peep Tunnel was re-opened, several excursion and relief trains between London and Hastings were run via Ashford at Whitsuntide, one excursion from St. Mary Cray to Hastings being hauled by 31639 (73C), lined black, with totem. SLS/195008
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1931 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1639
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31639    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM)    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (FAV)    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 31639    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev