Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4094 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23005 Week
» 87959 Month
» 290623 Year
» 3317476 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1672 |
m/e |
11/1891 |
British Railways |
31672 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Bob Tails |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 11/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1949 |
Service Life |
58 yrs , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1891 |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
m/e |
31/03/1946 |
WDN |
TON |
Tonbridge |
on |
10/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1672 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 31672 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1672 |
|
|
1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|