Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 782 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14188 Week
» 67204 Month
» 186731 Year
» 3213584 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1691 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
British Railways |
31691 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/10/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1900 |
FAV |
|
Faversham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
73C |
|
Hither Green |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73C |
Hither Green |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/10/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. |
SLS/195112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1691 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31691 |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31691 |
|
|