Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 582 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4264 Week
» 10972 Month
» 163925 Year
» 1829301 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1696 m/e 11/1900
British Railways 31696 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class R1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/03/1951
Service Life 50 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1900
FEL   Feltham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
FEL   Feltham P 02/01/1948
RDG   Reading (S.R.) 9w/e 01/03/1948
FAV   Faversham 4w/e 12/03/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 03/03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FEL Feltham P 02/01/1948
ALLOC RDG Reading (S.R.) 9w/e 01/03/1948
TOSTORE RDG Reading (S.R.) 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/03/1949
WDN   w/e 03/03/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/03/1951 Brighton Works New 2-6-4T No. 42687 came of works on 16th March. In shops were 15211/5, 31036 (? for scrap), 31696 (? for scrap), 31851 (works No. R.O.F. 35), 31892, 32422 (lined black), 32506 (lined black), 32518, 32570, 31635: new tanks are due off 42088 (29/3), 42089 (9/4), 42090 (17/4). It is understood that 'I.3' No. 32077 and a Wainwright 4-4-0 outside works are for scrap. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1900 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1696
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL)    
02/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (FEL)    
01/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (FAV)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31696    
03/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
03/03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31696    

prev