Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 542 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4224 Week
» 10932 Month
» 163885 Year
» 1829261 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1698 m/e 11/1900
British Railways 31698 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class R1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/10/1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1900
FEL   Feltham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
FEL   Feltham P 02/01/1948
RDG   Reading (S.R.) 9w/e 01/03/1948
FAV   Faversham 4w/e 12/03/1949
74D   Tonbridge 5w/e 14/02/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 15/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FEL Feltham P 02/01/1948
ALLOC RDG Reading (S.R.) 9w/e 01/03/1948
TOSTORE RDG Reading (S.R.) 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/03/1949
REINS 73E Faversham m/e 31/08/1950
TOSTORE 73E Faversham w/e 06/12/1951
TOSTORE 73E Faversham 2w/e 13/08/1952
REINS 74D Tonbridge 8w/e 03/03/1953
TOSTORE 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 08/02/1954
WDN   w/e 15/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1900 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1698
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL)    
02/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (FEL)    
01/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (FAV)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31698    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
15/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31698    
11/1955 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev