Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 32 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 850 Week
» 17801 Month
» 170754 Year
» 1836130 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1704 m/e 11/1900
British Railways 31704 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Class R1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/04/1956
Service Life 55 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1956

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1900
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E   Faversham 5w/e 14/02/1953
74D   Tonbridge 6w/e 27/03/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 14/04/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73E Faversham 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 3w/e 27/03/1953
WDN   w/e 14/04/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1900 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1704
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31704    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
14/04/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 31704    
05/1956 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev