Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18840 Week
» 71856 Month
» 191383 Year
» 3218236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1734 |
m/e |
04/1901 |
British Railways |
31734 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
Coppernobs |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 04/1901 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1901 |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
74D |
|
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
74D |
Tonbridge |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
REINS |
73E |
Faversham |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1734 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31734 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31734 |
|
|