Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 575 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 10965 Month
» 163918 Year
» 1829294 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1736 m/e 12/1901
British Railways 31736 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class D1
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal Sat 30/12/1950
Service Life 49 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1901
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
DOV   Dover Marine 4w/e 06/10/1948
     Withdrawn on 30/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 06/10/1948
REINS 74C Dover Marine 3w/e 10/06/1950
TOSTORE 74A Ashford on 24/06/1950
WDN   on 30/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1736
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
06/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (DOV)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31736    
30/12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 31736    
1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev