Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 566 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4248 Week
» 10956 Month
» 163909 Year
» 1829285 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1739 m/e 02/1901
British Railways 31739 y/e 1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class D1
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/11/1961
Service Life 60 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1901
FAV   Faversham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAT   Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/08/1948
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 06/10/1951
74D   Tonbridge 5w/e 08/10/1951
73B   Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 11/12/1952
75B   Redhill 5w/e 14/02/1953
73B   Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 20/07/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/08/1948
TOSTORE BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 11/12/1952
TOSTORE 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 08/01/1953
REINS 75B Redhill 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 2w/e 10/06/1953
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 11/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1739
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31739    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
08/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
11/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31739    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev