Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 524 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18327 Week
» 71343 Month
» 190870 Year
» 3217723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1761 |
m/e |
08/1914 |
British Railways |
31761 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
German Engines |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
During 08/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1956 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
m/e |
30/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
74D |
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
08/01/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
REINS |
74D |
Tonbridge |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
74D |
Tonbridge |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
REINS |
74D |
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
TOSTORE |
74D |
Tonbridge |
8w/e |
08/02/1955 |
REINS |
74D |
Tonbridge |
w/e |
13/06/1955 |
TOSTORE |
74D |
Tonbridge |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
74D |
Tonbridge |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1761 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31761 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
31/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31761 |
|
|
1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|