Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 302 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14345 Week
» 79299 Month
» 281963 Year
» 3308816 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1765 |
m/e |
08/1914 |
British Railways |
31765 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
German Engines |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
During 08/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/02/1961 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
74D |
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
08/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
73E |
Faversham |
7w/e |
19/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
P |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/12/1948 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. |
SLS/194901 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1765 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31765 |
|
|
19/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31765 |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|