Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 43 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 861 Week
» 17812 Month
» 170765 Year
» 1836141 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1798 m/e 08/1928
British Railways 31798 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1928
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1928
GFD   Guildford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72C   Yeovil Town 4w/e 10/03/1960
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. SLS/196204
25/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1928 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1798
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31798    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31798    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev