Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 575 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 10965 Month
» 163918 Year
» 1829294 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1799 m/e 07/1928
British Railways 31799 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/02/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1928
GFD   Guildford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C   Guildford 4w/e 11/04/1951
70C   Guildford 4w/e 13/04/1951
75B   Redhill 6w/e 09/02/1960
75C   Norwood Junction 4w/e 17/12/1962
70C   Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 07/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 07/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1928 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1799
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31799    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
07/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 31799    
05/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev