Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 35 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2833 Week
» 14515 Month
» 167468 Year
» 1832844 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1801 m/e 07/1928
British Railways 31801 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/06/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1928
GFD   Guildford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 12/05/1951
70C   Guildford w/e 06/12/1951
71A   Eastleigh 4w/e 01/10/1953
70C   Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/06/1951 Brighton Works On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1928 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1801
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31801    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31801    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev