Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 44 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2842 Week
» 14524 Month
» 167477 Year
» 1832853 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1802 m/e 07/1928
British Railways 31802 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1928
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1928
GFD   Guildford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 12/05/1951
70C   Guildford w/e 06/12/1951
73E   Faversham 6w/e 18/06/1954
71A   Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955
72C   Yeovil Town 4w/e 10/03/1960
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh w/e 21/06/1955
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1928 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1802
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31802    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31802    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev