Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 578 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4260 Week
» 10968 Month
» 163921 Year
» 1829297 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1805 m/e 03/1928
British Railways 31805 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1928
GFD   Guildford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
FRA   Fratton 5w/e 04/02/1950
71A   Eastleigh 4w/e 21/01/1952
75B   Redhill 5w/e 14/02/1953
71D   Fratton 8w/e 20/07/1953
70C   Guildford 5w/e 26/11/1959
72C   Yeovil Town 4w/e 10/03/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRA Fratton 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 7w/e 21/01/1952
ALLOC 75B Redhill 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 71D Fratton 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1928 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1805
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31805    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (FRA)    
21/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
03/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31805    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev