Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 528 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4210 Week
» 10918 Month
» 163871 Year
» 1829247 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1813 m/e 09/1920
British Railways 31813 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1920
Withdrawal w/e Sun 20/10/1963
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1920
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B   Salisbury 4w/e 01/10/1953
70C   Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 20/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71D Fratton 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 20/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1950 Ramblers\' Excursions On 9th July 1950, N. No. 31813-assisted by N. No. 31852 from Redhill, where a stop was made to attach-hauled an eleven-coach ramblers' special from Victoria to Forest Row via Three Bridges. On several occasions this year N. and U.1 class 'Moguls' have hauled crowded 11-coach ramblers' trains unaided over the Oxted line to Sheffield Park, Uckfield and Groombridge. The route of the first-named included three miles of 1 in 70 between Lingfield and East Grinstead and time was kept in all cases with gross loads of 375-400 tons. Ramblers' excursions have also been hauled over the Redhill-Shalford section-9 to 11 corridors-by classes L, L.1 and N. (31772, 31756, 31848, 31402). Judging by the pyrotechnic displays, coal consumption was not on the light side, and time was kept only by high downhill speeds on this switchback line. SLS/195101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1813
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31813    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
20/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31813    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev