Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 29 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 847 Week
» 17798 Month
» 170751 Year
» 1836127 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1822 m/e 05/1923
British Railways 31822 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class N1
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1923
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 39 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1923
STL   St Leonards on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C   Hither Green on 24/06/1950
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
75D   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 02/07/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STL St Leonards P 01/12/1947
ALLOC 73C Hither Green on 24/06/1950
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 16/06/1962
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Southern Region notes For the first time this year trains have been allowed through Bo-peep Tunnel, trial trips being made on Sunday, 4/6/from mid-day. The first steam train was hauled by 'N.1' 31822, followed by others with 30904 Lancing and 31766, from Bexhill West to Hastings. Six-coach and twelve-coach electric trains ran to consolidate the track and de-rust conductor rails, also to stable at Ore for Monday's services. SLS/195008
05/03/1951 Ashford Works In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1923 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1822
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31822    
24/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31822    
05/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev