Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 577 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4259 Week
» 10967 Month
» 163920 Year
» 1829296 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1836 m/e 07/1924
British Railways 31836 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1924
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1924
EXJ   Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
SAL   Salisbury 8w/e 08/01/1949
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/11/1950
72A   Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
     Withdrawn on 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
WDN   on 28/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1836
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31836    
08/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL)    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31836    
04/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev