Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 41 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2839 Week
» 14521 Month
» 167474 Year
» 1832850 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1840 m/e 08/1924
British Railways 31840 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 40 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1924
EXJ   Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72E   Barnstaple Junction 9w/e 30/06/1952
72A   Exmouth Junction 8w/e 07/10/1952
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 10w/e 07/10/1952
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1840
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31840    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31840    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev