Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 524 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4206 Week
» 10914 Month
» 163867 Year
» 1829243 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1844 m/e 08/1924
British Railways 31844 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1924
NORW   Norwood Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
AFD   Ashford 9w/e 01/08/1948
RED   Redhill 4w/e 30/06/1949
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
71D   Fratton 6w/e 13/08/1952
72E   Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AFD Ashford 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC RED Redhill 4w/e 30/06/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton 2w/e 13/08/1952
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 01/10/1953
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1844
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW)    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (AFD)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31844    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
13/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31844    
04/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev