Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 569 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4251 Week
» 10959 Month
» 163912 Year
» 1829288 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1849 m/e 02/1925
British Railways 31849 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal Mon 13/07/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1925
RED   Redhill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
     Withdrawn on 13/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
WDN   w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909
26/10/1951 Brighton Works New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. SLS/195112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1849
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31849    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
13/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31849    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev