Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 572 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4254 Week
» 10962 Month
» 163915 Year
» 1829291 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1856 m/e 03/1925
British Railways 31856 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Mon 13/07/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1925
EXJ   Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 06/10/1951
73C   Hither Green 5w/e 08/10/1951
70C   Guildford 5w/e 14/02/1953
75B   Redhill 4w/e 26/05/1953
73C   Hither Green 8w/e 20/07/1953
72A   Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
     Withdrawn on 13/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 75B Redhill 9w/e 26/05/1953
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/02/1961
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1856
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31856    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
13/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31856    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev