Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 27 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 845 Week
» 17796 Month
» 170749 Year
» 1836125 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1857 m/e 04/1925
British Railways 31857 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1925
RDG   Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
70B   Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
70C   Guildford 4w/e 22/10/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 70B Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 22/10/1962
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1857
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31857    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
22/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31857    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev