Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 575 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 10965 Month
» 163918 Year
» 1829294 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1859 m/e 04/1925
British Railways 31859 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1925
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
RED   Redhill 4w/e 01/04/1948
73A   Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
74B   Ramsgate m/e 30/11/1950
74C   Dover Marine 4w/e 08/12/1950
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
75C   Norwood Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
75A   Brighton 5w/e 06/07/1961
70C   Guildford m/e 08/12/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction 2w/e 31/08/1963
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC RED Redhill 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1859
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31859    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31859    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev