Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1101 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18904 Week
» 71920 Month
» 191447 Year
» 3218300 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1860 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
British Railways |
31860 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 04/1925 |
Withdrawal |
5w/e Sat 02/11/1963 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1860 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31860 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31860 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|