Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4388 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17794 Week
» 70810 Month
» 190337 Year
» 3217190 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1867 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
British Railways |
31867 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 07/07/1963 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/07/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1867 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31867 |
|
|
13/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
07/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31867 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|