|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1948 | Ashford Works | Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. | SLS/194901 |
31/05/1964 | Eastleigh Shed (Waiting Works or Scrap) | Ex Works: D2283, 34079, 75005, 82019. Waiting Works or Scrap: 30029, 30036, 30048, 30052/3, 30102/7/8, 30480, 30512, 30546/8, 30667, 30837, 31626/9, 31797, 31864/8, 32646, 32650, 32662, 34047, 34065/7, 34073, 76028. Interesting Locos: 70017 (5A) Failed, 75016 (5E), 4951 (81F). | SLS/196407 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1925 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1868 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG) | ||
02/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (RDG) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31868 | ||
22/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Faversham (73E) | ||
11/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
13/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31868 | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |