Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 35 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2833 Week
» 14515 Month
» 167468 Year
» 1832844 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1870 m/e 07/1925
British Railways 31870 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/04/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1925
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
FRA   Fratton 4w/e 06/10/1948
72D   Plymouth Friary 4w/e 13/11/1950
72D   Plymouth Friary 3w/e 30/11/1950
75A   Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1950
71D   Fratton 4w/e 05/02/1951
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951
73B   Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/10/1951
75B   Redhill 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 05/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRA Fratton 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 75A Brighton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 71D Fratton 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 05/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1870
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31870    
06/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (FRA)    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31870    
11/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev