|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/1951 | Ashford Works (In shops) | In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583. No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks. |
SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1925 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1871 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
01/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY) | ||
07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31871 | ||
08/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
12/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
08/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fratton (71D) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
08/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31871 | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |