Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4374 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17780 Week
» 70796 Month
» 190323 Year
» 3217176 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1873 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
British Railways |
31873 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 09/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 23/01/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
25/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
29/12/1963 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
18/01/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) |
In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1873 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31873 |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
18/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
23/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31873 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|