Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 203 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18006 Week
» 71022 Month
» 190549 Year
» 3217402 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1876 |
m/e |
03/1923 |
British Railways |
31876 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1923 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1876 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31876 |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31876 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|