Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 44 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2842 Week
» 14524 Month
» 167477 Year
» 1832853 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1877 m/e 04/1930
British Railways 31877 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class N1
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1930
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1930
STL   St Leonards on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HIT   Hither Green 3w/e 28/05/1949
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
75D   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 02/07/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STL St Leonards P 01/12/1947
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 25/06/1962
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/11/1947 St Leonards MPD Locos. under or awaiting repair here on 21st November last included 'V' 900/6, 'C1' C28 TON, 'N1' 1877, '01' 1432, 'El' tank 2129 TON ex loan to Gypsum Mines. SLS/194801

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1930 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1877
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL)    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31877    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31877    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev