Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 566 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4248 Week
» 10956 Month
» 163909 Year
» 1829285 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1878 m/e 04/1930
British Railways 31878 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class N1
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1930
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1930
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73J   Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
75D   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 02/07/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC HIT Hither Green P 01/12/1947
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 25/06/1962
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1930 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1878
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31878    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31878    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev