Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 555 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4237 Week
» 10945 Month
» 163898 Year
» 1829274 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1890 m/e 06/1928
British Railways 31890 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sun 30/06/1963
Service Life 35 yrs , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1928
BTN   Brighton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B   Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A   Brighton 6w/e 14/06/1959
75C   Norwood Junction 2w/e 10/10/1961
75E   Three Bridges 5w/e 02/07/1962
75A   Brighton 4w/e 17/12/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 30/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/01/1953
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 27/03/1953
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 17/12/1962
WDN   w/e 30/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1951 \"South-Western\" services Owing to the shortage of 'Pacifics' at Brighton, 'Atlantics' and No. 31890 have been seen during May on the through 'South-Western' services. SLS/195107
11/09/1963 Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1928 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1890
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31890    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
10/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
30/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31890    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev