Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 571 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4253 Week
» 10961 Month
» 163914 Year
» 1829290 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1917 m/e 04/1935
British Railways 31917 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class W
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 28 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1935
NORW   Norwood Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 17/12/1962
70B   Feltham 3w/e 30/01/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70B Feltham w/e 30/01/1963
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1935 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1917
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31917    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31917    
08/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev