Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 577 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4259 Week
» 10967 Month
» 163920 Year
» 1829296 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1920 m/e 08/1935
British Railways 31920 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class W
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/07/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1935
NORW   Norwood Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/02/1948 Brighton Station Unusual visitors to Brighton on 9/2 were Nos. 1918/20; 'W' tanks are not often seen there. Some half-dozen Eastern Section engines appear during the course of a week, especially on the through train from Sevenoaks due 8.24 a.m. (frequently an 'H' tank) and on the through from Tonbridge due 9.10 a.m. on which 'D' and 'Dl' classes appear (Nos. 1591, 1731, 1745, etc.). Otherwise the steam working is in the hands of the usual Central Section engines apart from Standard classes built since 1922, such as 'V,' 'N,' 'Ul,' and the two 'P' class tanks which are used for Kingston Wharf and shed coal stage duties SLS/194803
16/06/1951 Brighton Works On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1935 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1920
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31920    
07/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31920    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev