Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 31 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 849 Week
» 17800 Month
» 170753 Year
» 1836129 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1921 m/e 10/1935
British Railways 31921 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class W
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sun 23/06/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1935
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 20/08/1954
75C   Norwood Junction 4w/e 24/11/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 23/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane P 20/08/1954
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction P 24/11/1960
WDN   w/e 23/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/09/1963 Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1935 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1921
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31921    
20/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
23/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31921    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev