Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 41 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2839 Week
» 14521 Month
» 167474 Year
» 1832850 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1923 m/e 01/1936
British Railways 31923 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class W
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/02/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1936
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70B   Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 02/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70B Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 30/01/1963
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108
11/09/1963 Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1936 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1923
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31923    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
02/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31923    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev