Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 548 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4230 Week
» 10938 Month
» 163891 Year
» 1829267 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1924 m/e 02/1936
British Railways 31924 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class W
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/07/1964
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1936
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70B   Feltham 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 19/11/1962
75C   Norwood Junction 2w/e 28/09/1963
70B   Feltham m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 26/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70B Feltham 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 19/11/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 14/10/1963
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 26/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1936 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1924
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31924    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
19/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
26/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31924    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev