30/11/1947 |
Brighton Works |
: No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). |
SLS/194712 |
01/02/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops:-Nos. 21C101, CC2, 34004/05/20, 34061 73 Squadron, 34062/65, 2039/76/89, 2325, 2489, 2514, 32339, 32520 an 77062/94, for repair. Two 'Leader' Class under construction. No. 34090 left shops on 31/1 named Sir Eustace Missenden, Southern Railway Battle of Britain Class, the S.R. Coat-of-arms is also incorporated in the nameplate, the background of which is painted Air Force blue. The locomotive is painted malachite green with yellow lining, but the wheel centres instead of being black are also green and the tyres yellow. The British Railways crest is on the tender. |
SLS/194903 |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
20/03/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. |
SLS/195004 |
31/07/1950 |
General |
The new class '4' 2-6-4T locomotives are coming into service from Brighton Works fairly rapidly as part of the series of 11 numbered 42096-42106. The first three have been working from Brighton to Eastbourne, Tunbridge Wells, Tonbridge and elsewhere and at the time of writing had begun to be stationed at Tunbridge Wells for London turns. 'Atlantics' have been hauling through Brighton-Bournemouth trains and have also been seen again on relief Newhaven boat expresses and through Midlands trains. Two of them joined with three 'K' Moguls and a group of 'B4x' rebuilt Brighton 4-4-O's taken from store, to work special between Waterloo and Farnborough (Hants) on July 7-8 on the occasion ot the R.A.F. Air Pageant; the specials were formed of ex-L.N.E.R. suburban rolling stock rendered redundant by the Liverpool Street-Shenfield electrification and so available at a busy week-end, though not workable by the majority of S.R. locomotives on account of being fitted only with Westinghouse brake. Hence the employment of engines retaining Westinghouse gear. The Marsh 4-4-2T, No. 32089, from Eastbourne, worked local specials between Guildford and North Camp. Cutting-up of old locomotives at Horley has ceased. 'Atlantic' 32426, St. Albans Head, returned from overhaul at Eastleigh in new lined black livery with B.R. totem during July. Although of an obsolescent class, 'D3' bogie tanks, 32365, 32390, have just received new or reconditioned boilers, cylinders, etc., and new lined external finish for further push-and-pull work. A few more Wainwright 'H' 0-4-4T are being fitted for similar motor-train working, also at Ashford. 'K' Moguls have been used a good deal on through Midlands trains along the Sussex coast; 'B4x' also 'El' rebuilt 4-4-0's have traversed the 'cuckoo' single line through Heath-field, connecting Tunbridge Wells with Eastbourne, as have the new mixed traffic tanks. |
SLS/195010 |