Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14894 Week
» 67910 Month
» 187437 Year
» 3214290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2170 |
m/e |
12/1894 |
British Railways |
32170 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Small Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/07/1957 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/05/1951 |
Locos renumbered |
S.R. 2170 was renumbered 32170 in mid-May, and diesel sl will shortly be turned out as 15201. Thus the S.R. diesels have become 15201-15203 instead of 15200-15202 as originally ordained. The Southern Region has lost two more W.D., 2-8-0 to the L.M.R., 90226 from 73B and 90390 from 73C. No. 77150 has now become 90142, so that all remaining on the S.R. are now renumbered with the possible exception of 77226 (90194). |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2170 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32170 |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
20/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
27/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32170 |
|
|
08/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|