Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17912 Week
» 70928 Month
» 190455 Year
» 3217308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2283 |
m/e |
10/1879 |
British Railways |
32283 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
D1M |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1879 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1948 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1879 |
HOR |
|
Horsham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
WDN |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
on |
06/11/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Brighton Works |
21C116, fully painted, was in traffic during the last week in November, and 21C117 was running trials in shop grey, with green tender. W.D. 72401 is repainted black with yellow lettering on the tank sides. No. 2655 has had the condenser pipes removed and injectors fitted after a very heavy overhaul, which was practically a rebuild. No. 2662 is now in shops for similar treatment. The E2 No. 2101 is also under repair, and on arrival still had the large numerals on the tanks. It is understood that all the engines in the Isle of Wight will be repainted green as they go through shops. The Brighton Works Yard Shunter, 380S, had a Drummond type chimney fitted in November, and during the few days it was in shops No, 2662 took over the yard duties. The D1 tank, No. 2283, has been the Brighton Station shunter during the latter half of November in place of No. 2597. |
SLS/194602 |
31/07/1948 |
Eastbourne MPD |
Additional locomotives noted stored here in July were: 'D.1' 2283 and 'E5X' 32586, whilst of those previously stored, Nos. 2006/10/44 have proceeded to Eastleigh and No. 2397 to Ashford, for scrapping |
SLS/194809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1879 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2283 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2283 |
|
|
12/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32283 but not taken up |
|
|