Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1500 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14906 Week
» 67922 Month
» 187449 Year
» 3214302 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2345 |
m/e |
12/1916 |
British Railways |
32345 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
L. Billinton |
Class |
Moguls |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
46 yrs , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1916 |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75E |
|
Three Bridges |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75E |
Three Bridges |
2w/e |
10/06/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1947 |
Brighton Works |
New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2345 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32345 |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32345 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|