Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2962 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16368 Week
» 69384 Month
» 188911 Year
» 3215764 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2346 |
m/e |
12/1916 |
British Railways |
32346 |
y/e |
1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
L. Billinton |
Class |
Moguls |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1916 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/11/1962 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (awaiting scrap) |
Eastleigh shed contained the following locomotives awaiting scrap: 4656, 30033/45/65/70, 30199/225/494/502/17, 30690, 30770, 30917/26/9/37, 30955, 31892, 32346/9/50/1, 32408. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2346 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (RED) |
|
|
1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32346 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32346 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|